U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Brus v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • September 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 06, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 16, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.