U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Iowa State Penitentiary
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • November 19, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • May 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 16, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.