U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Hewitt v. Welch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Withdraw]
  • January 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 03, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • December 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • July 08, 2019: [Certification of Inmate Account]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.