U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Kimball v. Altoona Police Dept et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 12, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2020: [Leave to File]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 16, 2020: [Leave]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 21, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 25, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 24, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.