U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Cooks v. Naylor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 04, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 02, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 11, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • May 11, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
  • May 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • April 14, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 25, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 24, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • December 18, 2019: [Leave]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • October 21, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 03, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 16, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 12, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 05, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.