U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Goldsmith v. Adams County Iowa, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Permanent Injunction]
  • July 03, 2019: [Proposed Decree]
  • July 02, 2019: [Closing Documents]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.