U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00059
  • Case Name: GenoSource, LLC v. Inguran, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • September 18, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Stay]
  • June 06, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.