U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Johnston v. Celtic Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Recusal]
  • January 22, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 17, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 17, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Stay]
  • December 17, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 02, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • December 02, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2019: [Compel]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 31, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • September 09, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Set Aside Default Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 14, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Set Aside Default Entry]
  • August 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Default Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 23, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • July 22, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • July 22, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.