U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Kearns et al v. Rideout
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Substitute Party]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Brief /Other]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Substitute Party]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Removal By USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.