U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04022
  • Case Name: Ritchott v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Seal Document]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.