U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Bonneville v. Southwest Community College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2019: [Stay]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stay]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Reply]
  • August 01, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 14, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.