U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. Menard Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 02, 2020: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 17, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Jury Verdict]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 05, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 05, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 05, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • November 03, 2020: [Jury Selection]
  • November 03, 2020: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2020: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 13, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 13, 2020: [Trial Brief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 03, 2019: [Order]
  • August 03, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.