U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Shupe v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 18, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Withdraw]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Stay]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Stay]
  • June 07, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 31, 2019: [Certify Class]
  • May 31, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 31, 2019: [Expedite]
  • May 30, 2019: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.