U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Williams v. City of Burlington, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reconsideration]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 26, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 10, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Stay]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • February 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 09, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 01, 2021: [In Limine]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • January 29, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 26, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 26, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 18, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 23, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • October 23, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
  • June 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 08, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 27, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 26, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 29, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 29, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 13, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 06, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.