U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Windows USA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • April 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 25, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Joinder]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 02, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • December 31, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2019: [Errata]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 30, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 19, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 06, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.