U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Monsanto Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 31, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.