U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00160
  • Case Name: O'Halloran International Inc. v. Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • September 25, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.