U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Tasty Tacos, Inc. v. More Than Gourmet Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 19, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 18, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 18, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 28, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 07, 2019: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.