U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02035
  • Case Name: Burch v. Waterloo, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Seal Document]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.