U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Reply]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 03, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 12, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.