U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04005
  • Case Name: Unverferth Mfg Co, Inc. v. Meridian Mfg, Inc SEE ORDER TEXT AT [22] TO SEE WHY EXPERT WITNESS DDLS WERE NOT SET
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Continue Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Extension of Time]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.