U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Deaton v. Scott County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [Statement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • August 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 10, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 01, 2019: [Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 14, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 14, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.