U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03026
  • Case Name: In re: VeroBlue Farms USA, Inc, Debtor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 24, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 10, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Stay]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 05, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 02, 2019: [Compel]
  • July 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.