U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Pandis v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Witness List]
  • June 15, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 15, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • September 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 30, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2019: [Seal]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.