U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00045
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $1,500.00 in U.S. Currency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • January 16, 2020: [Default Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 18, 2019: [Default Entry by Clerk]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice - Other]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • June 17, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • June 17, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.