U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Mahammed v. Delta Global Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • August 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.