U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Terry v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 20, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.