U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • October 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 07, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 06, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 18, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.