U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Tizoc v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Brief /Other]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 06, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 19, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.