U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Walmart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.