U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Doe v. University of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Documents Sent]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 10, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Leave]
  • May 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2021: [Leave]
  • March 16, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 05, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 29, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 27, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2020: [TRO]
  • July 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 22, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 20, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 20, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 03, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 25, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • February 05, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 29, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • January 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 22, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 16, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 13, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 12, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 12, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 08, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • June 24, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 24, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 21, 2019: [Leave]
  • June 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.