U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Rhodes v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 07, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Brief /Other]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.