U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Alem Akok v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.