U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Millard v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.