U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Walker v. Sperfslage
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 24, 2022: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 11, 2021: [Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 24, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.