U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Gonzalez-Carmona v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Affidavit]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 10, 2020: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • August 12, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • August 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 24, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.