U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Warner v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 23, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 26, 2019: [Complaint]
  • June 25, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.