U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Johansen et al v. Clabaugh
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Seal]
  • July 30, 2019: [Seal]
  • July 30, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 30, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 25, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 23, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 19, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 08, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 25, 2019: [Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.