U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Chambers v. Loebsack
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.