U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Logisense Corporation v. Iowa Network Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 12, 2020: [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 24, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: [Counterclaim]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Waiver]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.