U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Tumoe v. Barr et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 08, 2020: [Statement]
  • May 08, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.