U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Freeborn v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Remand]
  • January 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 22, 2020: [Remand]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Brief /Other]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 09, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.