U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-04082
  • Case Name: Garang et al v. Smithfield Farmland Corp. et al PER 19 MINUTES, PARTIES INDICATE THAT AN INTERPRETER IS REQUIRED FOR TRIAL WITNESSES - PARTIES TO SECURE INTERPRETER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 08, 2019: [Protective Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.