U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Deaton v. Scott County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 11, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • July 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 10, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 09, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 01, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.