U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Dale v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 13, 2020: [Alter Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.