U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04014
  • Case Name: Shaffer v. Tewes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Enforce Settlement]
  • February 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.