U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Estate of Adam Wolf, et al. v. AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • July 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.