U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Gobin v. City of Muscatine
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • June 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 08, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 15, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Status Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 08, 2020: [Leave to File]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Leave]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.