U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Cameron Mitchell, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.