U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Homedew v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.